VA HB2518 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; mine inspection tax credit. Provides an income tax credit to mine operators for personnel expenses incurred when providing employees to accompany or assist a mine inspector or delegate of the Secretary of Labor during mine inspections or reviews.
Title
Income tax, state; mine inspection tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Finance | |
2011-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-24 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2011-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-21 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11103638D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2518 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2518+hil |