VA HB2515 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; payments made on behalf of enrollee. Requires any carrier issuing a health plan in the Commonwealth to count any payments made by another person on the enrollee's behalf, as well as payments made by the enrollee, when calculating the enrollee's overall contribution to any out-of-pocket maximum or any cost-sharing requirement under the carrier's health plan. This bill is identical to SB 1596.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health plans; calculation of enrollee's contribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 8-N 1-A) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N 1-A) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2515ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 8-N 1-A)
2019-02-18HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (88-Y 8-N 1-A)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-14SenateAmendment by Senator Dunnavant agreed to
2019-02-14SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N 1-A)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (83-Y 14-N 1-A)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 2-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103817D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823407.20(n/a)See Bill Text
3824214(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback