VA HB25 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permits; confidentiality of permittee information. Prohibits the clerk of the court from disclosing information contained on a concealed handgun permit application or on an order issuing a concealed handgun permit.
Title
Concealed handgun permit; confidentiality of permittee information.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] |
Del. Charles Poindexter [R] | Del. David Ramadan [R] | Del. Margaret Ransone [R] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (81-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-03 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2012-01-23 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-01-23 | House: Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2011-12-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-12-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100486D |