VA HB2497 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Towing and Recovery Operators. Abolishes the Board of Towing and Recovery Operators.
Title
Towing and Recovery Operators, Board of; abolishes Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter by voice vote | |
2011-01-31 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred from General Laws by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-21 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11104203D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4024 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2828 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2497 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2497+hil |