VA HB2474 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Collection and reporting of data related to adults charged with a criminal offense punishable by confinement in jail or a term of imprisonment; Virginia Longitudinal Data System. Allows the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission to contribute the statewide and locality-level data it collects on adults charged with criminal offenses punishable by incarceration to the Virginia Longitudinal Data System administered by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia.
Title
Adults charged with a criminal offense punishable by incarceration; collection & reporting of data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23102919D |