VA HB2467 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driving on a suspended or revoked license; period of suspension. Provides that any driver's license suspension imposed upon a person for the failure to pay court-ordered fines and costs shall run concurrently with any other period of license suspension, revocation, or forfeiture imposed upon such person. The bill also provides that in the event that a person whose license has been suspended for the failure to pay court-ordered fines and costs is convicted of driving on a suspended or revoked license, the additional period of license suspension imposed as a result of that conviction runs concurrently with the underlying suspension for the failure to pay court-ordered fines and costs. Under current law, such additional suspension period does not commence until the expiration of the previous suspension or revocation.
Title
Driving on a suspended or revoked license; period of suspension.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 700 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2467ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Deeds, Peake, Reeves |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Loupassi, Watts |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-22 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred from Transportation (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103953D |