VA HB2464 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Drug Control Act; Schedule II. Conforms Schedule II of the Drug Control Act to the federal drug classification schedule.
Title
Drug Control Act; conforms Schedule II to federal drug classification schedule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 700 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2464ER) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-27 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11104214D |