VA HB2460 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax credit; solar energy equipment. Creates a nonrefundable tax credit for the purchase and installation of solar energy equipment in certain nonresidential areas for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2019, but before January 1, 2024. The tax credit is capped at $100,000 per individual or 35 percent of the installed cost of the system, whichever is less. The aggregate amount of credits that can be issued in a fiscal year is capped at $10 million.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax, state; credit for solar energy equipment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in General Laws
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-28HouseReferred from Finance by voice vote
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101971D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581439.12:13(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback