VA HB246 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Code Commission; duties. Limits the duties of the Virginia Code Commission relating to the codification of laws enacted by the General Assembly to codifying only those laws for which the General Assembly has expressed its intent for such laws to be codified through the title of the bills relating to such laws. The bill also prohibits the Commission from excluding from the Code of Virginia a law for which the General Assembly has expressed its intent for the same to be codified through the title of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Code Commission; duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Rules (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Rules
2018-02-28SenateContinued to 2019 in Rules (13-Y 1-N)
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-06HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101033D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback