VA HB2446 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Senate: Letter sent to Commission on Electric Utility Regulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Senate: Letter sent to Commission on Electric Utility Regulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable energy portfolio standard program. Provides that an investor-owned electric utility will receive (i) double credit toward meeting the goals of the renewable energy portfolio standard program for energy from biomass or waste-to-energy; (ii) triple credit toward such goals for energy from sunlight; and (iii) quadruple credit toward such goals for energy from sunlight if the facility is located in Virginia and the majority of the products used to generate the energy are manufactured or assembled in the United States.
Title
Renewable energy portfolio standard program; coalbed methane gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Senate: Letter sent to Commission on Electric Utility Regulation | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (12-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #3 Special Subcommittee on Energy | |
2011-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11104093D |