VA HB2441 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Special identification card without a photograph; fee; confidentiality; penalties. Requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue a special identification card without a photograph to a person with a sincerely held religious belief prohibiting the taking of a photograph who would otherwise meet the qualifications for a special identification card but also presents an approved and signed IRS Form 4029. The bill allows a special identification card without a photograph to be similar in size, shape, and design to a driver's license but requires (i) that it be clearly distinguishable from a driver's license, (ii) that it not include a photograph of its holder, and (iii) that it clearly state that (a) the card does not authorize the holder to operate a motor vehicle, (b) federal limits apply, and (c) the card is not valid identification to vote. The bill provides that giving false information, concealing a material fact, or otherwise committing a fraud in applying for a special identification card without a photograph is guilty of a Class 2 misdemeanor and that obtaining a special identification card without a photograph for the purpose of committing any offense punishable as a felony constitutes a Class 4 felony. The bill contains technical amendments. This bill is the result of a study conducted by the Department of Motor Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special identification card without a photograph; fee, confidentiality, penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 832 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2441ER2)
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-05HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2441ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateRereferred from Transportation (9-Y 1-N)
2019-02-07SenateRereferred to Transportation
2019-02-07SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19100181D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2441E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseReported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N)
2019-01-28HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-25HouseReferred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
2019-01-24HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100181D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462345(n/a)See Bill Text
462345.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2441
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2441+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2441E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2441ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2441ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0832+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1901V0022+HB2441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0047+HB2441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2499+HB2441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0237+HB2441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0136+HB2441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0318+HB2441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2441+HB2441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0554HB2441+HB2441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3391+HB2441
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1172HB2441+HB2441

Bill Comments

feedback