VA HB2438 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal cases; delayed appeal. Allows a defendant to move for a delayed appeal when an appeal from a criminal case has been denied or the conviction has been affirmed due to failure to file or timely file the indispensible transcript or written statement of facts. This provision is added to the current provisions that a defendant may move for leave to pursue a delayed appeal from circuit court to the Court of Appeals and from the Court of Appeals to the Supreme Court when an appeal in a criminal case was never initiated or was dismissed for failure to adhere to proper form, procedures, and time limits due to error, neglect, or fault of counsel, court reporter, the court, or an officer or employee of the court.
Title
Criminal cases; delayed appeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 278 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2438ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2438H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104545D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104545D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11102127D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 321.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 321.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |