VA HB2430 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Produce Rx Program established; report. Directs the Department of Social Services to establish a Produce Rx Program as a three-year pilot program to incentivize consumption of qualifying fruits and vegetables by eligible individuals for whom increased consumption of fruits and vegetables is recommended by a qualified care provider, as such terms are defined in the bill, and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1 of each year on the operation of the Program.
Title
Produce Rx Program; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104412D |