VA HB2420 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; small business and microbusiness procurement enhancement program. Codifies the Governor's Executive Order 20 (2014) establishing a statewide small business and microbusiness procurement enhancement program. The bill establishes a statewide goal of 42 percent of small and microbusiness utilization in all discretionary spending by state agencies in procurement orders, prime contracts, and subcontracts. In addition, the bill provides for (i) a set-aside for competition among all small businesses for state agency purchases up to $100,000 for goods and nonprofessional services and up $50,000 for professional services and (ii) a set-aside for competition among microbusinesses for purchases under $10,000.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; small business and microbusiness procurement enhancement program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103911D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2420 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2420+hil |