VA HB2410 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Providing support to terrorist organizations; penalty. Provides that any person who knowingly provides any material support to an individual or organization whose primary objective is to commit an act of terrorism and does so with the intent to further such objective is guilty of a Class 3 felony. If the provision of such material support results in the death of any person, the penalty is increased to a Class 2 felony. The bill also expands the definition of an act of terrorism to include an act committed outside the Commonwealth that would meet the definition of an act of violence if such act was committed within the Commonwealth.
Title
Terrorist organization, designated; providing material support, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 624 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2410ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Howell, McDougle |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Gilbert, Bell, Robert B., Watts |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 17105362D-S1 (0-Y 97-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2410S1 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105362D-S1 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105362D-S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2410H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105165D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105165D-H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104472D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 46.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.5:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |