VA HB241 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Close relative adoption. Lowers from three years to two years the amount of time a child must have continuously resided with or been under the physical custody of the prospective close relative adoptive parent in order for the adoption proceeding to commence in circuit court and be exempt from the parental placement provisions.
Title
Adoption; lowers amount of time child must reside with close relative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004) | |
2018-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2018 | |
2018-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 02/12/18 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB241ER) |
2018-02-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103409D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 1242.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1242.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |