VA HB2402 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (6-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (6-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; willful violations; grounds for termination. Provides that if the court finds that any officer or employee of a public body (i) receives a request for records that was sent by a requester by certified mail, return receipt requested, and (ii) without legal excuse or justification deliberately, willfully, and knowingly fails to make a response to such request, such officer or employee may be terminated for cause by his appointing authority or agency head.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; willful violations, grounds for termination.
Sponsors
Del. Rick Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (6-Y 7-N) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 27-N) (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 27-N) (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (6-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 27-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (67-Y 27-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws (14-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17100847D |