VA HB2401 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; farm and horticultural laborers. Increases, from two to three, the number of full-time farm and horticultural laborers an employer may have in service and remain exempt from requirements of the Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
Workers' compensation; increases farm and horticultural laborers to remain exempt from requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 665 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2401ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2011-01-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-17 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11103990D |