VA HB24 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of South Hill. Updates the town's boundary description and replaces a reference to the town treasurer with "finance director." The bill also provides that the town manager, not the mayor, shall have power over the police forces. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Charter; Town of South Hill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 311 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB24ER) |
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-29 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-11-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-11-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100583D |
Same As/Similar To
SB653 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162)