VA HB239 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0289)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0289)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; deadline for applying for an absentee ballot to cast other than in person. Adjusts the deadline for a voter to apply for an absentee ballot that is to be cast by mail from the seventh day prior to the election to the eleventh day prior to the election. The bill also adjusts the deadline for applications for multiple elections for uniformed and overseas voters and for emergency applications and absentee ballots for persons incapacitated or hospitalized.
Title
Absentee voting; extends deadline for applying for an absentee ballot to cast other than in person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0289) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 289 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB239ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101270D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |