VA HB239 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sunday hunting; exceptions; raccoons. Removes the prohibition on hunting or killing raccoons after 2:00 a.m. on Sunday. This bill is identical to SB 375.
Title
Hunting with the assistance of dogs; hunting or killing raccoons on Sunday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 113 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB239ER) |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB239H2 |
2018-01-30 | House | Substitute by Delegate Kilgore agreed to 18106254D-H2 |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee substitute rejected 18105399D-H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-30 | House | Floor substitute printed 18106254D-H2 (Kilgore) |
2018-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105399D-H1 |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103859D |