VA HB239 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Division of fees among physicians. Clarifies rules prohibiting division of fees among physicians licensed to practice medicine or osteopathy in the Commonwealth and provides that rules prohibiting division of fees among physicians shall not prohibit (i) members of a group practice of physicians licensed to practice medicine or osteopathy from making any division of their total fees among themselves as they may determine; (ii) arrangements permitted under the Practitioner Self-Referral Act (§ 54.1-2410 et seq.); or (iii) certain payments, business arrangements, or payment practices that would be permitted in accordance with 42 U.S.C. § 1320a-7b(b)(3).
Title
Physicians; division of fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 76 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB239ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100438D |
Same As/Similar To
SB201 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)