VA HB2389 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Gas or oil drilling units; escrowed proceeds; school board. Provides that proceeds of certain gas or oil wells, escrowed because the owner's identity and location remain unknown, shall be presumed abandoned and made available to the school board nearest the drilling unit. Current law requires such escrowed proceeds to be disposed of pursuant to the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. The bill also provides that certain escrowed proceeds due to known and locatable claimants of coalbed methane gas wells that were force-pooled prior to July 1, 2015, shall be made available to the local school board when one year has passed and certain other conditions are met.
Title
Gas or oil drilling units; escrowed proceeds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104060D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1 | 361.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 361.22:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2389 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2389+hil |