VA HB238 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; prohibited contracts; exceptions for certain contracts entered into by an officer or employee of a soil and water conservation district. Provides an exception to the prohibition against officers and employees having contracts with their employing agencies for contracts by an officer or employee of a soil and water conservation district to participate in the Virginia Agricultural Best Management Practices Cost-Share Program. The exception does not apply to subcontracts or other agreements entered into to provide services for implementation of a cost-share contract established under the Program. Under the bill, the exception applies to contracts entered into prior to July 1, 2016.
Title
Conflict of Interests Act, State and Local Government; prohibited contracts, exceptions.
Sponsors
Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] |
Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 531 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB238ER) |
2016-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100860D |