VA HB2378 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB1554-Wilt) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB1554-Wilt) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Accreditation of schools; delayed implementation of certain statutes and regulations, etc. Provides for the delayed implementation of statutes and regulations upon which the accreditation of schools in the Commonwealth is based that were not already in effect on June 30, 2008, with the exception of the graduation and completion rate index, until July 1, 2012, unless such statutes or regulations are also specifically required by federal code, federal regulation, or court action. This bill was incorporated into
Title
Accreditation of schools; delayed implementation of certain statutes and regulations, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | House: Incorporated by Education (HB1554-Wilt) by voice vote | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1554-Wilt) by voice vote | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1554-Wilt) by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: #1 Standards of Quality | |
2011-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-13 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11101863D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2378 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2378+hil |