VA HB2368 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Involuntary civil admissions; evaluations. Directs the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, in conjunction with relevant stakeholders, to review the current practice of conducting emergency evaluations for individuals subject to involuntary civil admission and to develop a comprehensive plan to authorize psychiatrists and emergency physicians to evaluate individuals for involuntary civil admission where appropriate to expedite emergency evaluations. The review and recommendations shall be completed by November 15, 2015 and reported to the Governor, the Joint Subcommittee Studying Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the 21st Century, the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions, and the Senate Committee on Education and Health.
Title
Involuntary civil admissions; evaluations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 742 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2368ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's substitute printed 15105817D-H1 |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2368ER) |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Deeds ruled not germane 15105296D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Floor substitute printed to Web only 15105296D-S1 (Deeds) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103905D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2368E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-23 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103905D |