VA HB2328 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Six-Year Capital Outlay Plan. Specifies the process by which agencies' requests for capital projects are presented to the Six-Year Capital Outlay Plan Advisory Committee and the process the Advisory Committee shall follow.
Title
Six-Year Capital Outlay Plan; process by which agencies' requests for capital project are presented.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 697 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2328ER) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105198D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2328S1 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105198D-S1 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105198D-S1 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Printed as engrossed 11102774D-E | |
2011-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2328E | |
2011-01-27 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-24 | House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102774D |