VA HB2318 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Birth-Related Neurological Injury Compensation Program. Removes from the definition of "birth-related neurological injury" a provision that the definition shall apply retroactively to any child born on and after January 1, 1988, who suffers from an injury to the brain or spinal cord caused by the deprivation of oxygen or mechanical injury occurring in the course of labor, delivery, or resuscitation in the immediate postdelivery period in a hospital. The measure includes an enactment clause stating that its provisions are declarative of existing law. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2018.
Title
Virginia Birth-Related Neurological Injury Compensation Program; removes certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 756 (effective 1/1/18) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2318ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, Chafin, Lucas |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Stolle, Kilgore, Ward |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-22 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 95-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2318H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105096D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105096D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103278D |