VA HB2304 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial use of seals of the Commonwealth; commemorative coins. Specifies that commemorative coins minted at the direction of the Governor shall bear the seal of the Commonwealth on the obverse side of the coin and scenes of natural or historically significant locations in the Commonwealth as recommended by the Board of Tourism on the reverse side. The bill provides that proceeds from the sale of such coins shall be deposited in the Cooperative Marketing Fund established pursuant to § 2.2-2319.
Title
Commercial use of seals of the Commonwealth; commemorative coins, recommendations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 763 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2304ER2) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-12 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2304ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-29 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103761D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Authorities
Boundaries, Jurisdiction, and Emblems of the Commonwealth
Trade and Commerce
Authorities
Boundaries, Jurisdiction, and Emblems of the Commonwealth
Trade and Commerce