VA HB2302 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Farmers market food and beverage sales considered essential during state of emergency. Provides that any Commonwealth-based seller at a farmers market of food or beverage products, and the farmers market in which it is located, shall be considered an essential business to the same extent as grocery stores if such stores are allowed to remain open as essential businesses during a state of emergency declared by the Governor.
Title
Farmers market food and beverage products; sales considered essential during state of emergency.
Sponsors
Del. Scott Wyatt [R] | Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] |
Sen. John McGuire [R] | Del. Margaret Ransone [R] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Del. Michael Webert [R] | Del. Bill Wiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 26-N) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 26-N) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (74-Y 26-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (74-Y 26-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103106D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2302 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)