VA HB23 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Warning lights on certain vehicles. Provides that members of fire departments, volunteer fire companies, or volunteer rescue squads, ambulance drivers employed by a privately owned ambulance service, and police chaplains who equip a vehicle with flashing or steady-burning red or red and white combination warning lights may use no more than two "light systems" rather than two "lights."
Title
Warning lights on certain vehicles; members of fire depts., etc., may use no more than 2 systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Transportation |
2014-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2013-11-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-11-25 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100166D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB23 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB23+hil |