VA HB2298 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 25, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Banks; directors' meetings. Removes the ability of a bank's shareholders to fix the number that constitutes a quorum for a meeting of the bank's board of directors at not less than five. In its place, the measure authorizes a bank's shareholders to adopt a bylaw setting as a quorum a number that is not less than a majority of the bank's directors. This bill is identical to SB 1272.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Banks; directors' meetings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 25, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2298ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101445D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62866(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback