VA HB2274 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Meat; food labeling; misbranding. Provides that a food product shall be deemed misbranded if it purports to be, or is represented as, a meat food product while containing no meat, except to the extent that its label bears the word "imitation" followed by the name of the meat food product being imitated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Meat; food labeling, misbranding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100957D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325123(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback