VA HB2260 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Contractors; well water systems provider license; exception. Provides an exception to the licensing provisions relating to well water systems providers for any licensed plumbing tradesman performing normal maintenance and repair of water wells, water well pumps, and other equipment associated with the repair of water wells and water well systems, provided such tradesman has been continuously licensed as a plumbing tradesman under this article for at least three years, has not been the subject of any disciplinary proceeding by the Board, and has not engaged in any act that would constitute grounds for disciplinary action by the Board.
Title
Contractors, Board for; well water systems provider license, exception.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-20 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100377D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2260 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2260+hil |