VA HB2255 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0353)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0353)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State junior bear hunting license; fee. Creates a junior bear hunting license, separate from the combined big game hunting and junior hunting licenses, for any resident under the age of 16. The fee for such license is $5.50.
Title
Bear hunting; youth resident license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0353) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 353 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2255ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (82-Y 16-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2255H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105106D-H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105106D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102997D |