VA HB2252 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0830)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Firearms ordinances; applicability to property located in multiple localities. Allows a landowner whose property, including multiple contiguous parcels, spans two or more localities to elect to have the firearms ordinances of the locality in which the largest portion of the contiguous parcel lies apply to anyone hunting on the property. The bill requires any landowner making such an election to notify the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries. The measure will become effective if reenacted by the 2020 Session of the General Assembly. The measure also directs the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries study issues related to the application of inconsistent local firearm ordinances to properties located in more than one locality and report its findings to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources by the first day of the 2020 Regular Session.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms ordinances; applicability to property located in multiple localities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (29-Y 7-N) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0830)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 830 (effective - see bill)
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2252ER2)
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 10-N)
2019-04-03SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (29-Y 7-N)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 1-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-22HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2252ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 2-N)
2019-02-07SenateRereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-02-07SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (56-Y 42-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19105382D-EH1
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2252EH1
2019-02-04HouseAmendments by Delegate Head agreed to
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105382D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105382D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (9-Y 8-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103828D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291528.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2252
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2252+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2252H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2252EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2252ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2252ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0830+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0102V0016+HB2252
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0031+HB2252
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2428+HB2252
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0236+HB2252
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0089+HB2252
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB2252+HB2252
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0830HB2252+HB2252
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3384+HB2252
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1170HB2252+HB2252
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1173HB2252+HB2252
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1174HB2252+HB2252

Bill Comments

feedback