VA HB2250 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Humane Cosmetics Act; civil penalties. Prohibits a cosmetics manufacturer from: (i) conducting or contracting for cosmetic animal testing that occurs in the Commonwealth on or after January 1, 2022, (ii)manufacturing or importing for profit into the Commonwealth any cosmetic or ingredient thereof, if the cosmetics manufacturer knew or reasonably should have known that the cosmetic or any component thereof was developed or manufactured using cosmetic animal testing that was conducted on or after January 1, 2022; or (iii) beginning July 1, 2022, selling or offering for sale within the Commonwealth any cosmetic, if the cosmetics manufacturer knows or reasonably should know that the cosmetic or any component thereof was developed or manufactured using cosmetic animal testing that was conducted on or after January 1, 2022. Violations are subject to a civil penalty of up to $5,000 and an additional $1,000 for each day the violation continues. The bill preempts any local regulation on cosmetic animal testing. Humane Cosmetics Act; civil penalties. Prohibits a cosmetics manufacturer from: (i) conducting or contracting for cosmetic animal testing that occurs in the Commonwealth on or after January 1, 2022, (ii)manufacturing or importing for profit into the Commonwealth any cosmetic or ingredient thereof, if the cosmetics manufacturer knew or reasonably should have known that the cosmetic or any component thereof was developed or manufactured using cosmetic animal testing that was conducted on or after January 1, 2022; or (iii) beginning July 1, 2022, selling or offering for sale within the Commonwealth any cosmetic, if the cosmetics manufacturer knows or reasonably should know that the cosmetic or any component thereof was developed or manufactured using cosmetic animal testing that was conducted on or after January 1, 2022. Violations are subject to a civil penalty of up to $5,000 and an additional $1,000 for each day the violation continues. The bill preempts any local regulation on cosmetic animal testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Humane Cosmetics Act; civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-02HouseVOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N)
2021-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (62-Y 37-N)
2021-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2250H1
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103784D-H1
2021-02-01HouseRead second time
2021-01-29HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103784D-H1
2021-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-18HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102842D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591571(n/a)See Bill Text
591575(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2250
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2250+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2250H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103784D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103784.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2250F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2250FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1401V0030+HB2250
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H14V0094+HB2250
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1338+HB2250
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S02V0082+HB2250

Bill Comments

feedback