VA HB2228 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Aerospace Advisory Council; reorganize as Advisory Committee on Aerospace. Moves the existing Aerospace Advisory Council, renamed the Advisory Committee on Aerospace, to the Virginia Economic Development Partnership (VEDP) to advise VEDP on issues related to economic development and the aerospace sector. The current members of the Aerospace Advisory Council will continue to serve as members of the Advisory Committee on Aerospace. The Aerospace Advisory Council is currently an advisory council in the executive branch of government staffed by the Department of Aviation.
Title
Aerospace Advisory Council; reorganizes as Advisory Committee on Aerospace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources and Technology |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Science and Technology (20-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103649D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2239.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |