VA HB2227 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; denial of certain certificates. Prohibits the Commissioner of Health from denying an application for a certificate of public need for the addition of a new neonatal special care service at a medical care facility located in a planning district with a population of 275,000 or more in which there is only a single existing provider of such service or a new open heart surgery service at a medical care facility located in a planning district with a population of 2,000,000 or more in which there are two or more existing providers of such service solely because of the expected economic impact of the proposed project on an existing service in the planning district or the expected impact of the proposed project on the utilization of or volume of services delivered by an existing service in the planning district.
Title
Certificate of public need; denial of certain certificates.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102255D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2227 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2227+hil |