VA HB2225 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting on Sundays. Allows any person to hunt on private lands on Sunday, with the permission of the owner of the lands.
Title
Hunting; allows any person to hunt on private lands on Sunday with permission of owner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-21 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103370D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2225 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2225+hil |