VA HB2223 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sale of tobacco products. Provides that wrappings may be sold only in places that are not open to the general public and not generally accessible to minors and that an establishment which prohibits the presence of minors unless accompanied by an adult is not open to the general public. There is a civil penalty. Wrappings are defined in existing law as papers made or sold for covering or rolling tobacco or other materials for smoking in a manner similar to a cigarette or cigar.
Title
Tobacco products; wrappings may be sold in places not open to public and not accessible to minors.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Oder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-31 | House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2011-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101831D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2223 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2223+hil |