VA HB2222 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2222

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0231)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Military medical personnel program. Adds any facility that offers medical services to the public and that is supervised by one or more physicians or podiatrists to the list of entities that may participate in the military medical personnel program established by the Department of Veterans Services and directs the Department to assist veterans and other service members who are preparing for discharge or release and who have recently served in health care-related specialties but who do not meet the definition of "military medical personnel" in finding employment in the health care sector. Military medical personnel program. Adds any facility that offers medical services to the public and that is supervised by one or more physicians or podiatrists to the list of entities that may participate in the military medical personnel program established by the Department of Veterans Services and directs the Department to assist veterans and other service members who are preparing for discharge or release and who have recently served in health care-related specialties but who do not meet the definition of "military medical personnel" in finding employment in the health care sector.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military medical personnel program; facilities that offer medical services to public, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0231)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 231 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2222ER)
2021-02-19HouseEnrolled
2021-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateRead third time
2021-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2021-01-23HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-19HouseReferred from General Laws by voice vote
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102412D

Same As/Similar To

HB2222 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222001.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2222
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2222+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2222ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0231+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2222F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2222FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1202C0010+HB2222
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0095+HB2222
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1366+HB2222
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1428+HB2222
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0154+HB2222
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0033+HB2222
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0014HB2222+HB2222
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0020HB2222+HB2222

Bill Comments 750

feedback