VA HB2209 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; signature match; provisional ballot status. Requires the signature on the voter affirmation statement on an absentee ballot return envelope to match the signature of the voter on the application for the absentee ballot or the signature of the voter on file in his registration record. The general registrars are required to review the affirmation statement upon receipt of an absentee ballot returned by mail and to compare the signatures. An absentee ballot that is missing the signature or has a signature that does not match shall be handled as a provisional ballot. The voter is entitled to submit a cure affidavit, affirming that the ballot was submitted by him, is his ballot, and that he is registered and qualified to vote in such election, and a copy of a form of identification containing his name, signature, and photograph, until noon on the third day following the election. If, at the electoral board meeting for determining the validity of provisional votes, a majority of the board finds that the signature on the cure affidavit matches the signature on the absentee ballot, the vote shall be counted. Notice to the voter is required by email, text message, or telephone call, and if the absentee ballot is received on or before the seventh day preceding the election, by first-class mail as well.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; signature match, provisional ballot status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Election Administration
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101701D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242653.01(n/a)See Bill Text
242709.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242709.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback