VA HB2208 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Food stamp program; electronic benefit transfer (EBT) card. Requires that each EBT card issued to a food stamp program recipient display a photograph of the recipient. The bill directs the Department of Social Services to (i) establish procedures to ensure that all eligible household members or authorized representatives of the recipient are able to access benefits from the account as necessary; and (ii) enter into memoranda of understanding or other similar agreements with other departments, agencies, and institutions of the Commonwealth, including the Department of Motor Vehicles, to share photographs, when available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food stamp program; electronic benefit transfer (EBT) card.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-07HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100920D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632801(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback