VA HB2195 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers. Provides that if a retired law-enforcement officer was employed by a local school division as a school security officer on January 1, 2020, and had a bona fide break in service of at least one month between retirement and employment as a school security officer, such person is not required to establish a 12-month break in service that would otherwise be required by law.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102123D |