VA HB2191 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; procedures; sexually explicit instructional materials or related academic activities. Requires each school board's procedures for handling challenged controversial instructional materials to include procedures for (i) annually notifying the parent of any student enrolled in a course in which the instructional materials or related academic activities may include sexually explicit content of the potential for such sexually explicit content in such course and (ii) providing, as a replacement for instructional materials or related academic activities that include sexually explicit content, nonexplicit instructional materials or related academic activities to any student whose parent so requests. The bill defines "sexually explicit content" as content that involves any criminal sexual assault defined and punishable as a felony under Article 7 (§ 18.2-61 et seq.) of Chapter 4 of Title 18.2 of the Code of Virginia or any act defined and punishable as a felony under § 18.2-361.
Title
School boards; procedures for handling sexually explicit instructional materials, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Richard Anderson [R] |
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 25-N) (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 25-N) (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | (67 affirmative votes required to override) |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (65-Y 32-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House sustained Governor's veto (65-Y 32-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2191ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 25-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (71-Y 25-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Pending question ordered |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (73-Y 25-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2191H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104985D-H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104985D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102452D |