VA HB2184 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 7/1/23)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 7/1/23)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Judgment liens; release of specific property. Creates a procedure by which a settlement agent may release a property from a judgment lien when the lien creditor has failed to respond to a request in writing to pay the amount owed. Judgment liens; release of specific property. Creates a procedure by which a settlement agent may release a property from a judgment lien when the lien creditor has failed to respond to a request in writing to pay the amount owed.
Title
Judgment liens; release of specific property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2184ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2184H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105114D-H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105114D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104071D |