VA HB2177 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need. Amends the definition of "project" for which a certificate of public need is required to include capital expenditures of $15 million or more by or on behalf of a medical care facility other than a general hospital. Currently, all capital expenditures of $15 million or more by or on behalf of any medical care facility constitute a project for which a certificate of public need is required. The bill also provides that capital expenditures of $5 million or more by a general hospital shall be registered with the Commissioner of Health.
Title
Certificate of public need; eliminates regional health planning agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N) (Y: 94 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N) (Y: 94 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 651 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2177ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Reeves withdrawn |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB2177H2 |
2015-02-05 | House | Substitute by Delegate Orrock agreed to 15104802D-H2 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute rejected 15104186D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Floor substitute printed 15104802D-H2 (Orrock) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104186D-H1 |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103418D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 5307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 102.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 102.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 102.1:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 102.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 102.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 102.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 102.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 122.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 122.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 122.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 122.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 122.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 122.07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |