VA HB2176 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2176
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School board policies; abusive work environments; definitions. Defines, for the purposes of mandatory school board policies relating to abusive work environments, the terms "abusive conduct," "abusive work environment," "physical harm," and "psychological harm." The bill clarifies that the requirement to adopt such policies shall not be construed to limit a school board's authority to adopt policies to prohibit any other type of workplace conduct as the school board deems necessary. School board policies; abusive work environments; definitions. Defines, for the purposes of mandatory school board policies relating to abusive work environments, the terms "abusive conduct," "abusive work environment," "physical harm," and "psychological harm." The bill clarifies that the requirement to adopt such policies shall not be construed to limit a school board's authority to adopt policies to prohibit any other type of workplace conduct as the school board deems necessary.
Title
School board policies; abusive work environments, definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 42-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102247D-E |
2021-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2176E |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102247D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2176 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)