VA HB2175 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Use of photo-monitoring systems to enforce traffic light signals; appeals. Provides that operators found in violation of ordinances created to enforce photo-monitoring systems for traffic lights have a right to appeal to the circuit court in a civil proceeding.
Title
Photo-monitoring systems; use to enforce traffic light signals, appeals.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Johnny Joannou [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102765D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2175 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2175+hil |